E | 05/29/2015 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 3440 | |
House | 05/29/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5564 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2862 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3102 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2487 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Record vote | RV#1552 | Journal Page: 4801 |
House | 05/27/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4801 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4801 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/26/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4217 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Referred to House Administration | Journal Page: 2549 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2143 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1205 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1205 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1205 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1205 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 250 | |
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 250 | |
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |