House | 05/15/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3675 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2447 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2447 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2111 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1202 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1138 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1138 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1138 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1137 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1137 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1137 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1137 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1159 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1126 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1057 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 167 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 167 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |