Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR12 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Perry, et al. S.J.R. No. 12
22 (Pickett)
33
44
55 proposing a constitutional amendment prescribing the purposes for
66 which revenue from motor vehicle registration fees, certain motor
77 vehicle-related taxes, and certain revenues received from the
88 federal government may be used.
99 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. Sections 7-a and 7-b, Article VIII, Texas
1111 Constitution, are amended to read as follows:
1212 Sec. 7-a. Subject to legislative appropriation, allocation
1313 and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment of all
1414 refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived from
1515 motor vehicle registration fees, and all taxes, except gross
1616 production and ad valorem taxes, on motor fuels and lubricants used
1717 to propel motor vehicles over public roadways, shall be used for the
1818 sole purpose of acquiring rights-of-way and[,] constructing and[,]
1919 maintaining[, and policing] such public roadways[, and for the
2020 administration of such laws as may be prescribed by the Legislature
2121 pertaining to the supervision of traffic and safety on such roads;
2222 and for the payment of the principal and interest on county and road
2323 district bonds or warrants voted or issued prior to January 2, 1939,
2424 and declared eligible prior to January 2, 1945, for payment out of
2525 the County and Road District Highway Fund under existing law];
2626 provided, however, that one-fourth (1/4) of such net revenue from
2727 the motor fuel tax shall be allocated to the Available School Fund;
2828 and, provided, however, that the net revenue derived by counties
2929 from motor vehicle registration fees shall never be less than the
3030 maximum amounts allowed to be retained by each County and the
3131 percentage allowed to be retained by each County under the laws in
3232 effect on January 1, 1945. Nothing contained herein shall be
3333 construed as authorizing the pledging of the State's credit for any
3434 purpose.
3535 Sec. 7-b. All revenues received from the federal government
3636 as reimbursement for state expenditures of funds that are
3737 themselves dedicated for acquiring rights-of-way and constructing
3838 and[,] maintaining[, and policing] public roadways are also
3939 constitutionally dedicated and shall be used only for those
4040 purposes.
4141 SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to
4242 the Texas Constitution:
4343 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
4444 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
4545 Regular Session, 2015, prescribing the purposes for which revenue
4646 from motor vehicle registration fees, taxes on motor fuels and
4747 lubricants, and certain revenues received from the federal
4848 government may be used.
4949 (b) The amendments to Sections 7-a and 7-b, Article VIII, of
5050 this constitution apply only in connection with a state fiscal
5151 biennium that begins on or after September 1, 2017.
5252 (c) This temporary provision expires September 2, 2017.
5353 SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
5454 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
5555 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
5656 proposition: "The constitutional amendment prescribing the
5757 purposes for which revenue from motor vehicle registration fees,
5858 taxes on motor fuels and lubricants, and certain revenues received
5959 from the federal government may be used."