E | 05/26/2015 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 2404 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4570 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2089 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2163 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2004 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4435 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Record vote | RV#1423 | Journal Page: 4434 |
House | 05/24/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4434 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4434 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3787 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 2672 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2672 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1002 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 760 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 252 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 168 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 168 | |
Senate | 12/05/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/05/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |