E
|
05/21/2015
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4082
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1809
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1783
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3872
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1231
|
Journal Page: 3871
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 3871
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/20/15 11:50 AM
|
Journal Page: 3863
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3860
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3547
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2735
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 2549
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2549
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1365
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 696
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 670
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 670
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 670
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 670
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 670
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 669
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 669
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Creighton
|
Journal Page: 669
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 669
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 669
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 671
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 502
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 501
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 370
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 344
|
Senate
|
02/10/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 207
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 168
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 168
|
Senate
|
01/09/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|