1 | 1 | | 84R11506 MK-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Hall S.J.R. No. 44 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A JOINT RESOLUTION |
---|
6 | 6 | | proposing a constitutional amendment to change the number, method |
---|
7 | 7 | | of appointment, and terms of members of the Texas Ethics Commission |
---|
8 | 8 | | and providing for the governance, purpose, and mission of the |
---|
9 | 9 | | commission. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Section 24a, Article III, Texas Constitution, is |
---|
12 | 12 | | amended by amending Subsections (a), (b), and (c) and adding |
---|
13 | 13 | | Subsection (c-1) to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (a) The Texas Ethics Commission is a state agency consisting |
---|
15 | 15 | | of the following six [eight] members: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (1) three [two] members of the same political party as |
---|
17 | 17 | | the governor, [different political parties] appointed by the |
---|
18 | 18 | | governor [from a list of at least 10 names submitted by the members |
---|
19 | 19 | | of the house of representatives from each political party required |
---|
20 | 20 | | by law to hold a primary]; and |
---|
21 | 21 | | (2) three [two] members of a political party required |
---|
22 | 22 | | by law to hold a primary that is not the political party of the |
---|
23 | 23 | | governor, [different political parties] appointed by the governor |
---|
24 | 24 | | [from a list of at least 10 names submitted by the members of the |
---|
25 | 25 | | senate from each political party required by law to hold a primary; |
---|
26 | 26 | | [(3) two members of different political parties |
---|
27 | 27 | | appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives from a list |
---|
28 | 28 | | of at least 10 names submitted by the members of the house from each |
---|
29 | 29 | | political party required by law to hold a primary; and |
---|
30 | 30 | | [(4) two members of different political parties |
---|
31 | 31 | | appointed by the lieutenant governor from a list of at least 10 |
---|
32 | 32 | | names submitted by the members of the senate from each political |
---|
33 | 33 | | party required by law to hold a primary]. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (b) [The governor may reject all names on any list submitted |
---|
35 | 35 | | under Subsection (a)(1) or (2) of this section and require a new |
---|
36 | 36 | | list to be submitted.] The position of presiding officer of the |
---|
37 | 37 | | commission shall rotate biennially among the members of the |
---|
38 | 38 | | commission who are from the same political party as the governor |
---|
39 | 39 | | [shall elect annually the chairman of the commission]. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (c) Commission [With the exception of the initial |
---|
41 | 41 | | appointees, commission] members serve for staggered six-year |
---|
42 | 42 | | [four-year] terms. [Each appointing official will make one initial |
---|
43 | 43 | | appointment for a two-year term and one initial appointment for a |
---|
44 | 44 | | four-year term.] A vacancy on the commission shall be filled for |
---|
45 | 45 | | the unexpired portion of the term in the same manner as the original |
---|
46 | 46 | | appointment. A member who has served for one term and any part of a |
---|
47 | 47 | | second term is not eligible for reappointment. |
---|
48 | 48 | | (c-1) The purpose and mission of the Texas Ethics Commission |
---|
49 | 49 | | is to achieve the following objectives: |
---|
50 | 50 | | (1) controlling and reducing the cost of elections; |
---|
51 | 51 | | (2) eliminating opportunities for undue influence |
---|
52 | 52 | | over elections and governmental actions; |
---|
53 | 53 | | (3) promoting the full disclosure of information |
---|
54 | 54 | | related to expenditures and contributions for elections and for |
---|
55 | 55 | | petitioning the government; |
---|
56 | 56 | | (4) enhancing the potential for individual |
---|
57 | 57 | | participation in electoral and governmental processes; and |
---|
58 | 58 | | (5) ensuring the confidence and trust of the public in |
---|
59 | 59 | | the government of the state. |
---|
60 | 60 | | SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to |
---|
61 | 61 | | the Texas Constitution: |
---|
62 | 62 | | TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies to |
---|
63 | 63 | | the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature, |
---|
64 | 64 | | Regular Session, 2015, to change the number, method of appointment, |
---|
65 | 65 | | and terms of members of the Texas Ethics Commission and providing |
---|
66 | 66 | | for the governance, purpose, and mission of the commission. |
---|
67 | 67 | | (b) On January 1, 2016, the terms of all of the members of |
---|
68 | 68 | | the Texas Ethics Commission expire, and the governor shall appoint |
---|
69 | 69 | | two persons to terms expiring February 1, 2017, two persons to terms |
---|
70 | 70 | | expiring February 1, 2019, and two persons to terms expiring |
---|
71 | 71 | | February 1, 2021. Thereafter, members of the Texas Ethics |
---|
72 | 72 | | Commission serve six-year terms, as provided by Section 24a(c), |
---|
73 | 73 | | Article III, of this constitution. |
---|
74 | 74 | | (c) This temporary provision expires January 1, 2017. |
---|
75 | 75 | | SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be |
---|
76 | 76 | | submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015. |
---|
77 | 77 | | The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the |
---|
78 | 78 | | proposition: "The constitutional amendment providing for a |
---|
79 | 79 | | decrease in the size of the Texas Ethics Commission from eight to |
---|
80 | 80 | | six members who are appointed by the governor to serve six-year |
---|
81 | 81 | | terms, providing for the rotation of the position of presiding |
---|
82 | 82 | | officer of the commission, and providing for the purpose and |
---|
83 | 83 | | mission of the commission." |
---|