Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR44 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/11/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R11506 MK-D
 By: Hall S.J.R. No. 44


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment to change the number, method
 of appointment, and terms of members of the Texas Ethics Commission
 and providing for the governance, purpose, and mission of the
 commission.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 24a, Article III, Texas Constitution, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a), (b), and (c) and adding
 Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (a)  The Texas Ethics Commission is a state agency consisting
 of the following six [eight] members:
 (1)  three [two] members of the same political party as
 the governor, [different political parties] appointed by the
 governor [from a list of at least 10 names submitted by the members
 of the house of representatives from each political party required
 by law to hold a primary]; and
 (2)  three [two] members of a political party required
 by law to hold a primary that is not the political party of the
 governor, [different political parties] appointed by the governor
 [from a list of at least 10 names submitted by the members of the
 senate from each political party required by law to hold a primary;
 [(3)     two members of different political parties
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives from a list
 of at least 10 names submitted by the members of the house from each
 political party required by law to hold a primary; and
 [(4)     two members of different political parties
 appointed by the lieutenant governor from a list of at least 10
 names submitted by the members of the senate from each political
 party required by law to hold a primary].
 (b)  [The governor may reject all names on any list submitted
 under Subsection (a)(1) or (2) of this section and require a new
 list to be submitted.] The position of presiding officer of the
 commission shall rotate biennially among the members of the
 commission who are from the same political party as the governor
 [shall elect annually the chairman of the commission].
 (c)  Commission [With the exception of the initial
 appointees, commission] members serve for staggered six-year
 [four-year] terms. [Each appointing official will make one initial
 appointment for a two-year term and one initial appointment for a
 four-year term.] A vacancy on the commission shall be filled for
 the unexpired portion of the term in the same manner as the original
 appointment. A member who has served for one term and any part of a
 second term is not eligible for reappointment.
 (c-1)  The purpose and mission of the Texas Ethics Commission
 is to achieve the following objectives:
 (1)  controlling and reducing the cost of elections;
 (2)  eliminating opportunities for undue influence
 over elections and governmental actions;
 (3)  promoting the full disclosure of information
 related to expenditures and contributions for elections and for
 petitioning the government;
 (4)  enhancing the potential for individual
 participation in electoral and governmental processes; and
 (5)  ensuring the confidence and trust of the public in
 the government of the state.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies to
 the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2015, to change the number, method of appointment,
 and terms of members of the Texas Ethics Commission and providing
 for the governance, purpose, and mission of the commission.
 (b)  On January 1, 2016, the terms of all of the members of
 the Texas Ethics Commission expire, and the governor shall appoint
 two persons to terms expiring February 1, 2017, two persons to terms
 expiring February 1, 2019, and two persons to terms expiring
 February 1, 2021. Thereafter, members of the Texas Ethics
 Commission serve six-year terms, as provided by Section 24a(c),
 Article III, of this constitution.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment providing for a
 decrease in the size of the Texas Ethics Commission from eight to
 six members who are appointed by the governor to serve six-year
 terms, providing for the rotation of the position of presiding
 officer of the commission, and providing for the purpose and
 mission of the commission."