E
|
05/29/2015
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
Journal Page: 3440
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2862
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3102
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2487
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1564
|
Journal Page: 4827
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 4827
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
3-Canales
|
Journal Page: 4827
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4827
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
2-Craddick
|
Journal Page: 4826
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4826
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1486
|
Journal Page: 4648
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/27/15 12:01 AM
|
Journal Page: 4648
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4648
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-Howard
|
Journal Page: 4647
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4647
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4484
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1441
|
Journal Page: 4483
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4483
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4483
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3107
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3107
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1783
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1029
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 968
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 968
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 968
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 817
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 499
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 499
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|