House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2447 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2447 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2136 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1249 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Campbell | Journal Page: 1178 |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 612 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 612 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |