Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR14

Caption

Recognizing Johnny Smecca for being named the Galvestonian of the Year for 2014.

Impact

The resolution highlights Smecca's contributions to numerous organizations within Galveston, including the Galveston Independent School District and the Galveston Humane Society. His work exemplifies the positive impact that local business leaders can have on community engagement and development. The resolution serves to officially recognize and celebrate his efforts, potentially inspiring other local leaders and business owners to follow his example in supporting local initiatives.

Summary

Senate Resolution No. 14 honors Johnny Smecca for his accomplishments and contributions as the Galvestonian of the Year for 2014. Smecca, the co-owner and managing partner of the Galveston Restaurant Group, has been instrumental in enhancing the local community through his various initiatives and active involvement in the city's governance. His company not only operates multiple restaurants in Galveston but has also been a significant supporter of local charities and institutions, underlining his commitment to community development.

Contention

While the resolution is largely celebratory, it reflects broader themes of community leadership and civic responsibility. In honoring an individual from the restaurant industry, it subtly sheds light on the importance of local businesses in fostering economic growth and cultural richness in communities, which can often face challenges due to economic fluctuations or policy changes.

Notable_points

Awards received by Smecca such as the Sam Walton Business Community Leader Award and Kiwanian of the Year underscore his influence and reputation within both the business community and civic society. The passage of SR14 signifies legislative recognition of individual contributions to state identity and community cohesion.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

TX HR427

Recognizing March 1, 2023, as Galveston County Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR246

Recognizing March 1, 2023, as Galveston County Day.

TX SR209

Recognizing March 6, 2025, as Galveston County Day.

TX HR108

Recognizing March 6, 2025, as Galveston County Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR1548

Recognizing March 30, 2015, as Galveston County Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR677

Recognizing March 1, 2017, as Galveston County Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR265

Recognizing March 6, 2019, as Galveston County Day.

TX HR591

Recognizing March 6, 2019, as Galveston County Day at the State Capitol.