Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR252 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/24/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 252
 WHEREAS, Citizens from Hill County are visiting Austin to
 celebrate Hill County Day at the State Capitol on February 26,
 2015, and it is indeed appropriate to take this opportunity to
 pay tribute to this notable Texas county; and
 WHEREAS, Located in North Central Texas east of the Brazos
 River, Hill County was created from a section of Navarro County
 by an act of the state legislature on February 7, 1853; it was
 named for Dr. George Washington Hill, a member of the Congress of
 the Republic of Texas and secretary of war and the navy under
 President Sam Houston; on May 14, 1853, an election was held in
 Lexington on Jack's Branch to determine the county's first public
 officials, and later that same year, Hillsboro was platted and
 designated the county seat; and
 WHEREAS, Now home to about 35,000 people, Hill County has
 grown with the changing times while still maintaining the appeal
 of a small rural county; the restored county courthouse in
 Hillsboro, which is listed in the National Register of Historic
 Places, serves as the center for county business, and Hill
 College provides access to an array of high-technology academic
 and workforce-training educational programs, presents a popular
 performing arts series, and is the site of the Texas Heritage
 Museum with its extensive collection of Audie Murphy artifacts
 and a comprehensive library and archive on the Civil War; and
 WHEREAS, Of special interest to Texas music fans
 everywhere, Hill County is the birthplace of legendary singer and
 songwriter Willie Nelson, who was born in Abbott and graduated
 from high school there; and
 WHEREAS, Hill County communities host a number of special
 events each year, among them the Hill County Fair and the Cotton
 Pickin' Fair in Hillsboro, Pioneer Days in Whitney, the Cinco de
 Mayo Celebration in Itasca, and Hubbard City Trade Days, and
 these festivities showcase the county's hospitality,
 agricultural roots, scenic beauty, and heritage; residents and
 visitors alike also enjoy the myriad recreational opportunities
 offered by Lake Whitney State Park; and
 WHEREAS, Those who call Hill County home may take
 justifiable pride in their county's distinctive character and
 the many qualities that make it such an outstanding place in
 which to live, work, and raise a family; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 84th
 Legislature, hereby recognize February 26, 2015, as Hill County
 Day at the State Capitol and extend to the visiting delegation
 sincere best wishes for an enjoyable stay in Austin.
 Birdwell
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 24, 2015.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate