Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR320 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/04/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 320
 In Memory
 of
 Keith Everest Friend
 WHEREAS, The certain knowledge of a life well lived may
 temper the profound loss felt by the loved ones of Keith Everest
 Friend of Grapevine, who passed away on November 8, 2014, at the
 age of 48; and
 WHEREAS, Born to Pat and Julie Friend on September 8, 1966,
 Keith Friend graduated from L. D. Bell High School in Hurst and
 went on to attend Texas State University in San Marcos; he
 married Lori, his high school sweetheart, on July 8, 1989, and
 they settled in Grapevine, where they raised their children,
 Amber and Andrew; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Friend was a longtime employee of IBM; he was
 also an active volunteer scout leader and a committee member with
 Boy Scout Troop 905 in Colleyville, and he was a former den leader
 for Cub Scout Pack 817 in Grapevine; he encouraged his young
 charges to participate in all aspects of the Boy Scout life and
 motivated them to set and achieve personal goals, and through his
 example, he showed them how to be a caring friend and a dedicated
 leader; even as he battled cancer during the last six and a half
 years of his life, he maintained a positive attitude and
 continued to be involved in scouting activities; and
 WHEREAS, In addition to his volunteer work with the Boy
 Scouts, Mr. Friend enjoyed playing the guitar and sharing his
 musical knowledge with beginning players; he also worked with the
 youth at his church for many years, and he served as a
 compassionate mentor to fellow cancer patients, lending them a
 sympathetic ear and reminding them that they were not alone in
 their struggles; he was unfailingly generous with his time, but
 most of all, he treasured the moments he spent with his loved
 ones, whose days were made brighter by his warmth, humor, and
 affection; and
 WHEREAS, Although his days on this earth were far too few,
 Keith Friend left an indelible mark on the lives of many, and his
 devotion to his family and to the youth of his community will
 forever inspire all who had the good fortune to know him; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 84th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Keith Everest
 Friend and extend sincere condolences to the members of his
 family:  his wife, Lori Friend; his children, Amber and Andrew
 Friend; his parents, Julie Mason and Pat Friend; his sister,
 Elaine Christine Lincoln; and his other relatives, his scout
 family, and all who mourn his passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Keith Friend.
 Nelson
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 4, 2015, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate