Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR401 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/19/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 401
 In Memory
 of
 David Silva
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Bee County Judge David Silva, who died
 March 16, 2015, at the age of 70; and
 WHEREAS, David Silva was born on May 26, 1944, in Beeville;
 a 1963 graduate of A. C. Jones High School, he served the nation
 with distinction as a member of the United States Air Force; and
 WHEREAS, He married Yolanda Olivares on July 11, 1970, and
 they shared 44 years of marriage together; they were blessed with
 two daughters, Cassandra and Cristianna, and a granddaughter,
 Audria; and
 WHEREAS, He earned a master's degree from Texas A&I
 University in Corpus Christi, and he enjoyed a long and
 fulfilling career in academia at Bee County College, later known
 as Coastal Bend College; he was named Teacher of the Year on
 multiple occasions and served as chair of the Social Science
 Division; and
 WHEREAS, After his retirement, he began a second career in
 public service; he served as a municipal court judge, and in
 2006, he was elected Bee County Judge and became the first judge
 in the county to be elected to the office three times; he was
 active in a number of community organizations and served on
 several boards and committees; and
 WHEREAS, Judge Silva was a man of courage, integrity, and
 strength, and his devotion to his family, his deep religious
 faith, and his enthusiasm for living each day to the fullest will
 not be forgotten by those who were privileged to share in his
 life; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 84th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of David Silva; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of David Silva.
 Zaffirini
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 19, 2015, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate