Senate | 05/22/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1907 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1907 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1907 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1907 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1722 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1296 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1296 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |