Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR661 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/29/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 661
 In Memory
 of
 David Allen Abernathy
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas joins the citizens
 of Anahuac in mourning the loss of David Allen "Bubba" Abernathy,
 who died April 17, 2015, at the age of 70; and
 WHEREAS, David Abernathy was born October 17, 1944, in Alvin,
 to David and Pauline Abernathy; he married the love of his life,
 Mary Annette Willcox, on September 19, 1964, and the couple
 enjoyed 50 years of marriage together; they raised two children
 and were blessed with seven grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Abernathy served the nation with distinction
 for eight years in the United States Air Force; he was trained in
 radar and electronics, and his service included a tour of duty in
 Vietnam; and
 WHEREAS, After his military service, Mr. Abernathy returned
 with his family to Anahuac, where he and his wife owned and operated
 Abernathy's Meat Market for more than 25 years and Abernathy's
 Home Center for 10 years; and
 WHEREAS, He served as Precinct 2 commissioner for Chambers
 County for six years; his many contributions to the community
 also included work with the Anahuac Little League, the Anahuac
 Optimist Club, the Lions Club, and the American Legion, and he was
 the founder of the Chambers County Youth Project Show 100 Club; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Abernathy was devoted to his family; he took
 special care in mentoring his children and grandchildren, and he
 delighted in the regular family reunions that he and his wife
 held for more than 30 years; and
 WHEREAS, A man of courage, strength, and compassion, he gave
 generously to others, and his wisdom, warmth, and valued counsel
 will not be forgotten; and
 WHEREAS, He was a devoted husband, father, and grandfather,
 and he leaves behind memories that will be treasured forever by
 his family and his many friends; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 84th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of David Allen Abernathy; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for his
 family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas Senate
 and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in memory of
 David Allen "Bubba" Abernathy.
 Creighton
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on April 29, 2015, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate