Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR735 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/07/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 735
 In Memory
 of
 Floyd D. Simpson
 WHEREAS, The citizens of Corpus Christi lost an admired
 public servant with the untimely death of Corpus Christi Chief of
 Police Floyd D. Simpson on May 3, 2015, at the age of 51; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Chicago on September 19, 1963, Floyd
 Simpson earned a bachelor's degree from Western Illinois
 University and a master's degree in business administration from
 Amber University; he was also a graduate of the Police Executive
 Research Forum Senior Management Institute, the Federal Bureau
 of Investigation National Academy, and the Law Enforcement
 Management Institute of Texas; and
 WHEREAS, Before taking charge of the department in Corpus
 Christi, Chief Simpson served more than 25 years with the Dallas
 Police Department, where his duties included management of the
 patrol and administration bureaus as well as oversight of the
 department's police academies and hiring process; he retired in
 2012, at the rank of assistant chief; and
 WHEREAS, On March 12, 2012, this veteran law enforcement
 professional became the 22nd chief of police in Corpus Christi,
 and the first African American to lead the department; under his
 leadership, crime in the city decreased for three consecutive
 years and traffic-related fatalities were the lowest in two
 decades; he worked to ensure transparency in police matters, and
 he was also making great strides in his commitment to bolster
 department pride, instituting official ceremonies for officers
 receiving promotions and other department activities; and
 WHEREAS, In addition to his professional duties, Chief
 Simpson was engaged in civic affairs as well; he organized a
 charity motorcycle ride in Dallas with his riding club, the Iron
 Knights, to raise money for children with sickle cell anemia; an
 avid runner with four marathons to his credit, he was also a
 member of the executive committee of the Special Olympics Texas
 Law Enforcement Torch Run; in 2013, he received the President's
 Award from the National Association for the Advancement of
 Colored People at the 43rd annual Martin Luther King Jr. Freedom
 Fund Banquet; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Simpson shared 27 rewarding years with his
 wife, Tanya, and he was a devoted father to his four children,
 Amber, Lauren, Journee, and Jaylen; and
 WHEREAS, Although he had only been in Corpus Christi for
 three years, Chief Simpson quickly made a name for himself in the
 community, earning the admiration and affection of a great many
 people and implementing a vision for the department that will
 continue to resonate for years to come; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 84th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of Corpus Christi
 Chief of Police Floyd D. Simpson and extend sincere condolences
 to the members of his family:  to his wife, Tanya Simpson; to his
 children, Amber Simpson, Lauren Simpson, Journee Simpson, and
 Jaylen Little; and to his other relatives and friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Floyd Simpson.
 Hinojosa
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 7, 2015, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate