Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR82 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/02/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 82
 In Memory
 of
 Lester J. Reed
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of noted chemist and researcher Lester J.
 Reed, who died January 14, 2015, at the age of 90; and
 WHEREAS, Lester Reed was born on January 3, 1925, in New
 Orleans, Louisiana; he was drawn to a life in science at an early
 age after his sister gave him a chemistry set, and he went on to
 earn a bachelor's degree from Tulane University and a doctoral
 degree in organic chemistry from the University of Illinois at
 Urbana-Champaign; and
 WHEREAS, He met Janet Gruschow while pursuing postdoctoral
 studies at the Cornell University Medical School, and they
 married on August 7, 1948; they raised four children together and
 were blessed with two grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Reed joined the chemistry faculty at The
 University of Texas at Austin in 1948; over the course of his
 distinguished 53-year career at the university, he served as a
 mentor to countless scientists and scholars around the world, and
 in 1984, he was named the Ashbel Smith Professor; and
 WHEREAS, His groundbreaking work and publications on the
 first isolation of lipoic acid had a profound impact on the
 treatment of chronic liver disease, and he was recognized
 internationally for his scientific brilliance; he served as
 director of the Clayton Foundation Biochemical Institute for
 more than 30 years; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Reed's numerous honors for his work include
 the Eli Lilly and Company Award in Biological Chemistry from
 the American Chemical Society and the Merck Award from the
 American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology; he
 was elected to membership in the National Academy of
 Sciences, and he was elected a Fellow of the American Academy
 of Arts and Sciences; and
 WHEREAS, He was a man of strength, wisdom, and integrity
 who gave unselfishly to others; his generous spirit and his
 enthusiasm for living each day to the fullest will not be
 forgotten; and
 WHEREAS, He was a devoted husband, father, and grandfather,
 and he leaves behind memories that will be treasured forever by all
 who were privileged to share in his life; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 84th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Lester J. Reed; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Lester J. Reed.
 Watson
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 2, 2015, by
  a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate