Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR913 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/20/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 913
 In Memory
 of
 Job M. Reigoux
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Staff Sergeant Job M. Reigoux, who died
 in the line of duty June 1, 2013, at the age of 30 while serving
 his country in Afghanistan; and
 WHEREAS, Job Reigoux was born April 15, 1983, in Austin, to
 Reuben Reigoux-Rios and Maria E. Guevara; he was quiet and
 reserved as a young man, and his interests included working on
 classic sports cars with his father; he was a 2001 graduate of
 Echelon Charter School; and
 WHEREAS, He met his wife and the love of his life, Erica
 Santiago, while working in retail, and the couple was blessed
 with two children, Seth and Maddison; and
 WHEREAS, Shortly after his marriage to Erica, he enlisted
 in the United States Army and began his service stationed in
 Schweinfurt, Germany, in 2006; he was twice deployed to Iraq and
 was serving in Afghanistan with the 3rd Battalion, 69th Armor
 Regiment, 1st Brigade Combat Team, 3rd Infantry Division, when he
 gave his last full measure of devotion to his country; his
 decorations included a Purple Heart and a Bronze Star; and
 WHEREAS, Sergeant Reigoux is part of the long line of
 courageous men and women whose bravery and sacrifice have left a
 lasting mark on the world; his unwavering dedication to duty and
 honor embodied the highest ideals of the United States Army; and
 WHEREAS, A young man of courage, strength, and compassion,
 he gave unselfishly to others, and his ready humor, his generous
 spirit, and his enthusiasm for living each day to the fullest
 will not be forgotten by those who were privileged to share in his
 life; and
 WHEREAS, He was a devoted son, brother, husband, and
 father, and he leaves behind memories that will be treasured
 forever by his family and many friends; and
 WHEREAS, In recognition of his ultimate sacrifice in the
 Global War on Terror, Staff Sergeant Reigoux is being
 posthumously honored at a Joint Memorial Day Ceremony in the
 Texas House of Representatives on May 23, 2015; now, therefore,
 be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 84th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Job M. Reigoux; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Job M. Reigoux.
 Watson   Watson
  Watson
 Bettencourt Hall Perry Bettencourt Hall Perry
Bettencourt Hall Perry
 Birdwell Hancock Rodríguez Birdwell Hancock Rodríguez
Birdwell Hancock Rodríguez
 Burton Hinojosa Schwertner Burton Hinojosa Schwertner
Burton Hinojosa Schwertner
 Campbell Huffines Seliger Campbell Huffines Seliger
Campbell Huffines Seliger
 Creighton Huffman Taylor of Galveston Creighton Huffman Taylor of Galveston
Creighton Huffman Taylor of Galveston
 Ellis Kolkhorst Taylor of Collin Ellis Kolkhorst Taylor of Collin
Ellis Kolkhorst Taylor of Collin
 Eltife Lucio Uresti Eltife Lucio Uresti
Eltife Lucio Uresti
 Estes Menéndez West Estes Menéndez West
Estes Menéndez West
 Fraser Nelson Whitmire Fraser Nelson Whitmire
Fraser Nelson Whitmire
 Garcia Nichols Zaffirini Garcia Nichols Zaffirini
Garcia Nichols Zaffirini
 Patrick, President of the Senate
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 20, 2015, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate

  Watson

Bettencourt Hall Perry

Birdwell Hancock Rodríguez

Burton Hinojosa Schwertner

Campbell Huffines Seliger

Creighton Huffman Taylor of Galveston

Ellis Kolkhorst Taylor of Collin

Eltife Lucio Uresti

Estes Menéndez West

Fraser Nelson Whitmire

Garcia Nichols Zaffirini