Senate | 04/10/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 937 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1431 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1122 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#149 | Journal Page: 1121 |
House | 04/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1121 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1121 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1097 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1097 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 837 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 578 | |
House | 03/07/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 578 | |
House | 01/12/2017 | Filed |