Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB104 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: White (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 104
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
3- May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
4- Justice; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
5- Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 104
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to notification provided to certain victims of criminal
126 offenses.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. Chapter 2, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
159 amended by adding Article 2.023 to read as follows:
1610 Art. 2.023. NOTIFICATION TO TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL
1711 JUSTICE. (a) This article applies only to a defendant who, in
1812 connection with a previous conviction for an offense listed in
1913 Article 42A.054(a) or for which the judgment contains an
2014 affirmative finding under Article 42A.054(c) or (d):
2115 (1) received a sentence that included imprisonment at
2216 a facility operated by or under contract with the Texas Department
2317 of Criminal Justice; and
2418 (2) was subsequently released from the imprisonment,
2519 including a release on parole, to mandatory supervision, or
2620 following discharge of the defendant's sentence.
2721 (b) Not later than the 10th day after the date that a
2822 defendant described by Subsection (a) is indicted for an offense
2923 listed in Article 42A.054(a) or for which the judgment contains an
3024 affirmative finding under Article 42A.054(c) or (d), the attorney
3125 representing the state shall notify an officer designated by the
3226 Texas Department of Criminal Justice of the offense charged in the
3327 indictment.
3428 SECTION 2. Chapter 493, Government Code, is amended by
3529 adding Section 493.0251 to read as follows:
3630 Sec. 493.0251. VICTIM NOTIFICATION OF SUBSEQUENT FELONY.
3731 (a) In this section, "victim," "guardian of a victim," and "close
3832 relative of a deceased victim" have the meanings assigned by
3933 Section 508.117.
4034 (b) If the department receives a notification under Article
4135 2.023, Code of Criminal Procedure, regarding the indictment of a
4236 defendant described by that article, the department shall, to the
4337 extent requested under Subsection (c), make a reasonable effort to
4438 provide notice of the offense charged in the indictment to each
4539 victim, guardian of a victim, or close relative of a deceased victim
4640 of an offense described by Article 2.023(a), Code of Criminal
4741 Procedure, for which the defendant was previously imprisoned at a
4842 facility operated by or under contract with the department and
4943 subsequently released.
5044 (c) The department shall adopt a procedure by which a
5145 victim, guardian of a victim, or close relative of a deceased victim
5246 may:
5347 (1) request to receive notice under this section; and
5448 (2) inform the department of the person's address for
5549 purposes of providing the notice.
5650 (d) Except as necessary to comply with this section, the
5751 board or the department may not disclose to any person the name or
5852 address of a person entitled to notice under this section unless:
5953 (1) the person approves the disclosure; or
6054 (2) a court determines that there is good cause for the
6155 disclosure and orders the board or the department to disclose the
6256 information.
6357 SECTION 3. Not later than November 1, 2017, the Texas
6458 Department of Criminal Justice shall adopt rules necessary to
6559 implement Section 493.0251, Government Code, as added by this Act.
6660 SECTION 4. Article 2.023, Code of Criminal Procedure, as
6761 added by this Act, applies only to a criminal case in which the
6862 indictment is presented to the court on or after December 1, 2017.
6963 A criminal case in which the indictment is presented to the court
7064 before December 1, 2017, is governed by the law in effect on the
7165 date the indictment is presented, and the former law is continued in
7266 effect for that purpose.
7367 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
74- * * * * *
68+ ______________________________ ______________________________
69+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
70+ I certify that H.B. No. 104 was passed by the House on April
71+ 28, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 0, 2 present, not
72+ voting.
73+ ______________________________
74+ Chief Clerk of the House
75+ I certify that H.B. No. 104 was passed by the Senate on May
76+ 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
77+ ______________________________
78+ Secretary of the Senate
79+ APPROVED: _____________________
80+ Date
81+ _____________________
82+ Governor