Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB104 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: White (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 104
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notification provided to certain victims of criminal
 offenses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 2.023 to read as follows:
 Art. 2.023.  NOTIFICATION TO TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL
 JUSTICE. (a) This article applies only to a defendant who, in
 connection with a previous conviction for an offense listed in
 Article 42A.054(a) or for which the judgment contains an
 affirmative finding under Article 42A.054(c) or (d):
 (1)  received a sentence that included imprisonment at
 a facility operated by or under contract with the Texas Department
 of Criminal Justice; and
 (2)  was subsequently released from the imprisonment,
 including a release on parole, to mandatory supervision, or
 following discharge of the defendant's sentence.
 (b)  Not later than the 10th day after the date that a
 defendant described by Subsection (a) is indicted for an offense
 listed in Article 42A.054(a) or for which the judgment contains an
 affirmative finding under Article 42A.054(c) or (d), the attorney
 representing the state shall notify an officer designated by the
 Texas Department of Criminal Justice of the offense charged in the
 indictment.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 493, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 493.0251 to read as follows:
 Sec. 493.0251.  VICTIM NOTIFICATION OF SUBSEQUENT FELONY.
 (a) In this section, "victim," "guardian of a victim," and "close
 relative of a deceased victim" have the meanings assigned by
 Section 508.117.
 (b)  If the department receives a notification under Article
 2.023, Code of Criminal Procedure, regarding the indictment of a
 defendant described by that article, the department shall, to the
 extent requested under Subsection (c), make a reasonable effort to
 provide notice of the offense charged in the indictment to each
 victim, guardian of a victim, or close relative of a deceased victim
 of an offense described by Article 2.023(a), Code of Criminal
 Procedure, for which the defendant was previously imprisoned at a
 facility operated by or under contract with the department and
 subsequently released.
 (c)  The department shall adopt a procedure by which a
 victim, guardian of a victim, or close relative of a deceased victim
 may:
 (1)  request to receive notice under this section; and
 (2)  inform the department of the person's address for
 purposes of providing the notice.
 (d)  Except as necessary to comply with this section, the
 board or the department may not disclose to any person the name or
 address of a person entitled to notice under this section unless:
 (1)  the person approves the disclosure; or
 (2)  a court determines that there is good cause for the
 disclosure and orders the board or the department to disclose the
 information.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than November 1, 2017, the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice shall adopt rules necessary to
 implement Section 493.0251, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  Article 2.023, Code of Criminal Procedure, as
 added by this Act, applies only to a criminal case in which the
 indictment is presented to the court on or after December 1, 2017.
 A criminal case in which the indictment is presented to the court
 before December 1, 2017, is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the indictment is presented, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *