E | 06/15/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/15/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6064 | |
E | 05/30/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6062 | |
Senate | 05/29/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4237 | |
House | 05/28/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6032 | |
House | 05/27/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6040 | |
House | 05/25/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4819 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3034 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3034 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3034 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3034 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3034 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3034 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3034 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2113 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1761 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1761 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1693 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3026 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2787 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#910 | Journal Page: 2786 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2786 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2786 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2697 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2697 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 402 | |
House | 02/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 402 | |
House | 01/17/2017 | Filed |