1 | | - | By: Thompson of Brazoria (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 1075 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017; |
---|
3 | | - | May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | | - | Education; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
5 | | - | Yeas 9, Nays 1; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 1075 |
---|
10 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 5 | | relating to the frequency of criminal background checks for sports |
---|
12 | 6 | | officials registered with the University Interscholastic League. |
---|
13 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 33.085, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
15 | 9 | | amending Subsections (b) and (c) and adding Subsection (c-1) to |
---|
16 | 10 | | read as follows: |
---|
17 | 11 | | (b) The league may require a sports official, as a condition |
---|
18 | 12 | | of eligibility to officiate a contest sponsored by the league, to: |
---|
19 | 13 | | (1) be registered with the league and comply with the |
---|
20 | 14 | | registration requirements of Subsections [Subsection] (c) and |
---|
21 | 15 | | (c-1); |
---|
22 | 16 | | (2) have completed initial and continuing education |
---|
23 | 17 | | programs regarding league rules; |
---|
24 | 18 | | (3) be a member in good standing of a local chapter or |
---|
25 | 19 | | association of sports officials recognized by the league for that |
---|
26 | 20 | | purpose; and |
---|
27 | 21 | | (4) agree to abide by league rules, including fee |
---|
28 | 22 | | schedules and travel reimbursement guidelines for payment by school |
---|
29 | 23 | | districts or open-enrollment charter schools to a sports official. |
---|
30 | 24 | | (c) In registering with the league, a sports official must |
---|
31 | 25 | | be required to provide directory information required by the league |
---|
32 | 26 | | and undergo an initial [submit to a] criminal background check. |
---|
33 | 27 | | (c-1) To maintain registration with the league, a sports |
---|
34 | 28 | | official must: |
---|
35 | 29 | | (1) maintain compliance with conditions of |
---|
36 | 30 | | eligibility required by the league under Subsection (b); and |
---|
37 | 31 | | (2) undergo a subsequent criminal background check |
---|
38 | 32 | | once every three years following the date of the initial criminal |
---|
39 | 33 | | background check under Subsection (c). |
---|
40 | 34 | | SECTION 2. (a) Section 33.085, Education Code, as amended |
---|
41 | 35 | | by this Act, applies to each sports official authorized to |
---|
42 | 36 | | officiate a contest sponsored by the University Interscholastic |
---|
43 | 37 | | League, regardless of whether an official initially registered with |
---|
44 | 38 | | the league under that section before the effective date of this Act. |
---|
45 | 39 | | (b) The University Interscholastic League shall ensure that |
---|
46 | 40 | | each sports official registered under Section 33.085, Education |
---|
47 | 41 | | Code, before the effective date of this Act undergoes a subsequent |
---|
48 | 42 | | criminal background check not later than September 1, 2020. |
---|
49 | 43 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
50 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 44 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 45 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 46 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 1075 was passed by the House on May 6, |
---|
| 47 | + | 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 9, 2 present, not |
---|
| 48 | + | voting. |
---|
| 49 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 50 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 51 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 1075 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 52 | + | 22, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0. |
---|
| 53 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 54 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 55 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 56 | + | Date |
---|
| 57 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 58 | + | Governor |
---|