Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1075 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Thompson of Brazoria (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 1075
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 1; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the frequency of criminal background checks for sports
 officials registered with the University Interscholastic League.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 33.085, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (b) and (c) and adding Subsection (c-1) to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The league may require a sports official, as a condition
 of eligibility to officiate a contest sponsored by the league, to:
 (1)  be registered with the league and comply with the
 registration requirements of Subsections [Subsection] (c) and
 (c-1);
 (2)  have completed initial and continuing education
 programs regarding league rules;
 (3)  be a member in good standing of a local chapter or
 association of sports officials recognized by the league for that
 purpose; and
 (4)  agree to abide by league rules, including fee
 schedules and travel reimbursement guidelines for payment by school
 districts or open-enrollment charter schools to a sports official.
 (c)  In registering with the league, a sports official must
 be required to provide directory information required by the league
 and undergo an initial [submit to a] criminal background check.
 (c-1)  To maintain registration with the league, a sports
 official must:
 (1)  maintain compliance with conditions of
 eligibility required by the league under Subsection (b); and
 (2)  undergo a subsequent criminal background check
 once every three years following the date of the initial criminal
 background check under Subsection (c).
 SECTION 2.  (a) Section 33.085, Education Code, as amended
 by this Act, applies to each sports official authorized to
 officiate a contest sponsored by the University Interscholastic
 League, regardless of whether an official initially registered with
 the league under that section before the effective date of this Act.
 (b)  The University Interscholastic League shall ensure that
 each sports official registered under Section 33.085, Education
 Code, before the effective date of this Act undergoes a subsequent
 criminal background check not later than September 1, 2020.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *