E
|
05/26/2017
|
Effective on 1/1/18
|
|
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5684
|
E
|
05/19/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4005
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2119
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3780
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3743
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2052
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2052
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2052
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2052
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2052
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2052
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2052
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1903
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1361
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2190
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2080
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#518
|
Journal Page: 2079
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2079
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2079
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 914
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 419
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 419
|
House
|
01/18/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|