Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1101 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Pickett, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 1101
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 11, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; May 11, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the chief appraiser of an appraisal
 district to require a person to file a new application to confirm
 the person's current qualification for the exemption from ad
 valorem taxation of the total appraised value of the residence
 homestead of a 100 percent disabled veteran.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.43, Tax Code, is amended by amending
 Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (r) to read as follows:
 (c)  An exemption provided by Section 11.13, 11.131, 11.132,
 11.133, 11.17, 11.18, 11.182, 11.1827, 11.183, 11.19, 11.20, 11.21,
 11.22, 11.23(a), (h), (j), (j-1), or (m), 11.231, 11.254, 11.27,
 11.271, 11.29, 11.30, 11.31, or 11.315, once allowed, need not be
 claimed in subsequent years, and except as otherwise provided by
 Subsection (e), the exemption applies to the property until it
 changes ownership or the person's qualification for the exemption
 changes.  However, except as provided by Subsection (r), the chief
 appraiser may require a person allowed one of the exemptions in a
 prior year to file a new application to confirm the person's current
 qualification for the exemption by delivering a written notice that
 a new application is required, accompanied by an appropriate
 application form, to the person previously allowed the exemption.
 If the person previously allowed the exemption is 65 years of age or
 older, the chief appraiser may not cancel the exemption due to the
 person's failure to file the new application unless the chief
 appraiser complies with the requirements of Subsection (q), if
 applicable.
 (r)  The chief appraiser may not require a person allowed an
 exemption under Section 11.131 to file a new application to
 determine the person's current qualification for the exemption if
 the person has a permanent total disability determined by the
 United States Department of Veterans Affairs under 38 C.F.R.
 Section 4.15.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2018.
 * * * * *