House | 05/03/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2373 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | RV#690 | Journal Page: 2373 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 2373 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Point of order overruled | Rule 8, Section 1(a) | Journal Page: 2372 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2372 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Postponed | 5/3/17 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2272 |
House | 05/02/2017 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 8, Section 1(a) | Journal Page: 2272 |
House | 05/02/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2272 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1768 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 419 | |
House | 02/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 419 | |
House | 01/18/2017 | Filed |