E
|
05/26/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5684
|
E
|
05/18/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3742
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3746
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3605
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1961
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1961
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1961
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1961
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1961
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1961
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1961
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1766
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1258
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1258
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1148
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1553
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#268
|
Journal Page: 1552
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1552
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1552
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1523
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1523
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1424
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Referred to Government Transparency & Operation
|
|
Journal Page: 692
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 692
|
House
|
02/28/2017
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 493
|
House
|
02/28/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 493
|
House
|
01/18/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|