Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1116 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kacal (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 1116
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2017;
 April 24, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 9, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the repeal of certain state procurement advisory and
 approval procedures.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 2155.086 and 2155.087, Government Code,
 are repealed.
 SECTION 2.  On the effective date of this Act, the Statewide
 Procurement Advisory Council is abolished.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *