Senate | 05/05/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1683 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1683 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1360 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2104 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Record vote | RV#545 | Journal Page: 2103 |
House | 04/28/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2103 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2103 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2049 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2049 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1509 | |
House | 04/10/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/13/2017 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 279 | |
House | 02/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 279 | |
House | 11/14/2016 | Filed |