E
|
06/01/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/01/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/25/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5573
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2963
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4565
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4147
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1523
|
Journal Page: 4147
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4147
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3887
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2139
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2139
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2139
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2139
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1952
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1011
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1509
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1458
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#228
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#219
|
Journal Page: 1443
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1443
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1443
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 777
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 406
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 406
|
House
|
01/19/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|