LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
House
Bills
HB1178
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB1178
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1178
Compare Versions
HB1178 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1178 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1178 Enrolled May 22, 2017
HB1178 Comm Sub May 15, 2017
HB1178 Engrossed April 12, 2017
HB1178 Comm Sub March 20, 2017
HB1178 Introduced January 19, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
HB1178 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1178 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1178 Enrolled May 22, 2017
HB1178 Comm Sub May 15, 2017
HB1178 Engrossed April 12, 2017
HB1178 Comm Sub March 20, 2017
HB1178 Introduced January 19, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare