Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1197 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Paul (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 1197
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 20, 2017;
 April 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 9, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 9, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the training period for a temporary insurance agent's
 license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 4001.160(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  An agent, insurer, or health maintenance organization
 that is considering appointment of a temporary license applicant as
 its agent shall provide at least 40 hours of training to the
 applicant not later than the 30th [14th] day after the date the
 application, nonrefundable fee, and certificate are delivered or
 mailed to the department.
 SECTION 2.  Section 4001.160(a), Insurance Code, as amended
 by this Act, applies only with respect to an applicant for a
 temporary license whose application is delivered or mailed to the
 Texas Department of Insurance on or after the effective date of this
 Act.  With respect to an applicant whose application is delivered or
 mailed before that date, an agent, insurer, or health maintenance
 organization is governed by the law as it existed immediately
 before the effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *