Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Returned from the House for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 2495
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Returned to the Senate for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 4251
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3889
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Huffines
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2151
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2151
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2111
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2021
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1694
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3026
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#955
|
Journal Page: 2822
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2822
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2822
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2727
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#866
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1424
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 476
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 476
|
House
|
01/25/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|