LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
House
Bills
HB1291
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB1291
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1291
Compare Versions
HB1291 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1291 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1291 Comm Sub May 16, 2017
HB1291 Engrossed May 6, 2017
HB1291 Comm Sub April 6, 2017
HB1291 Introduced January 25, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
HB1291 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1291 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1291 Comm Sub May 16, 2017
HB1291 Engrossed May 6, 2017
HB1291 Comm Sub April 6, 2017
HB1291 Introduced January 25, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare