Senate | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1661 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1661 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1362 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Record vote | RV#562 | Journal Page: 2117 |
House | 04/28/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2117 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2117 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2056 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Amended | 1-Faircloth | Journal Page: 2056 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2056 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1032 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 476 | |
House | 02/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 476 | |
House | 01/25/2017 | Filed |