E | 05/29/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/29/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6063 | |
E | 05/26/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5683 | |
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3567 | |
House | 05/25/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5092 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5095 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4569 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2608 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2608 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2608 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2607 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2607 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2607 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2607 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2449 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1913 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1913 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1694 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3026 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#915 | Journal Page: 2790 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2790 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2790 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2699 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2699 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1032 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 476 | |
House | 02/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 476 | |
House | 01/25/2017 | Filed |