E
|
06/15/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6066
|
E
|
05/18/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3663
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3665
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3487
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1910
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1910
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1910
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1910
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1910
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1910
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1910
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1766
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1765
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1605
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1605
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#243
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2017
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 496
|
House
|
02/28/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 496
|
House
|
02/01/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|