House | 05/12/2017 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | Journal Page: 3396 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 3396 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1842 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1427 | |
House | 03/01/2017 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 528 | |
House | 03/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 528 | |
House | 02/01/2017 | Filed |