Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1432 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Vo (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 1432
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
 April 19, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources & Economic Development; May 4, 2017, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 4, 2017, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to restrictions or conditions on certain payments to the
 Texas Workforce Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 213, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 213.012 to read as follows:
 Sec. 213.012.  RESTRICTIONS OR CONDITIONS ON PAYMENTS
 PROHIBITED.  (a)  In this section, "payment instrument" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 151.301, Finance Code.
 (b)  A person may not place on a payment instrument remitted
 to the commission any restriction or condition purporting to limit
 the amount of contributions, penalties, or interest owed to the
 commission by an employer.
 (c)   A restriction or condition in violation of this section
 is void.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *