Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1434 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Simmons, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 1434
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 27, 2017;
 April 6, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 3, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to displaying certain informational materials and videos
 in driver's license offices.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.0062 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.0062.  INFORMATION ON DRIVING WITH AUTISM. The
 department may make available, in a publicly accessible area of a
 driver's license office, informational materials and videos on
 driving with autism that are developed by an appropriate entity, as
 determined by the department.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *