House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1067 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2017 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 499 | |
House | 02/28/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 499 | |
House | 02/01/2017 | Filed |