E | 05/22/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 05/22/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4575 | |
E | 05/11/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3456 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1825 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3235 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3391 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3152 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1754 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1754 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1754 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1754 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1754 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1754 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1754 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1005 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1005 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 842 | |
House | 03/31/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1068 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 957 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Record vote | RV#131 | Journal Page: 956 |
House | 03/30/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 956 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 956 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 922 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 922 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 866 | |
House | 03/22/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 580 | |
House | 03/07/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 580 | |
House | 02/02/2017 | Filed |