E
|
06/15/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6066
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR 62
|
Journal Page: 6055
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR 62
|
Journal Page: 4234
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3535
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5420
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1921
|
Journal Page: 5420
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5420
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4836
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3100
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3100
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3100
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3100
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3100
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3100
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3100
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 3097
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 West
|
Journal Page: 3094
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3094
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3094
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3093
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2880
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1949
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1620
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2646
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#681
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2290
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2289
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 581
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 581
|
House
|
02/02/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|