Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1694
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3026
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2796
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#921
|
Journal Page: 2795
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2795
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2795
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2702
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2702
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2702
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Returned to Calendars Committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1697
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1697
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 866
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 603
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 603
|
House
|
02/02/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|