House | 05/05/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2703 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Record vote | RV#859 | Journal Page: 2702 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 2702 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2702 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 605 | |
House | 03/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 605 | |
House | 02/03/2017 | Filed |