E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/27/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5565
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5573
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4572
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2877
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2226
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1726
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3156
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2892
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1002
|
Journal Page: 2891
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2891
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2891
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2852
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Amended
|
2-Price
|
Journal Page: 2851
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2851
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/6/17 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1842
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
House
|
02/03/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|