Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1559 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Frullo (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 1559
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
3- April 19, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
4- Administration; May 9, 2017, reported favorably by the following
5- vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 9, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 1559
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to the provision of surplus lines insurance to certain
126 commercial insureds.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 981, Insurance Code, is
159 amended by adding Section 981.0033 to read as follows:
1610 Sec. 981.0033. INDUSTRIAL INSURED DEFINED. For purposes of
1711 this chapter, "industrial insured" means a person who purchases
1812 commercial insurance and, at the time of placement:
1913 (1) employs or retains a qualified risk manager to
2014 negotiate insurance coverage; and
2115 (2) either:
2216 (A) has paid aggregate nationwide commercial
2317 property and casualty insurance premiums of more than $25,000 in
2418 the immediately preceding 12 months; or
2519 (B) employs at least 25 full-time employees.
2620 SECTION 2. Section 981.004, Insurance Code, is amended by
2721 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
2822 (d) Subsection (a)(1) does not apply to insurance procured
2923 for an industrial insured if:
3024 (1) the agent procuring or placing the insurance
3125 discloses to the industrial insured that:
3226 (A) comparable insurance may be available from
3327 the admitted market that is subject to more regulatory oversight
3428 than the surplus lines market; and
3529 (B) a policy purchased in the admitted market may
3630 provide greater protection than the surplus lines insurance policy;
3731 (2) the surplus lines company offering the coverage
3832 has a financial strength rating of A- or better from the A. M. Best
3933 Company; and
4034 (3) after receiving the notice described by
4135 Subdivision (1), the industrial insured requests in writing that
4236 the agent procure the insurance from or place the insurance with an
4337 eligible surplus lines insurer.
4438 SECTION 3. Section 981.215(a), Insurance Code, is amended
4539 to read as follows:
4640 (a) A surplus lines agent shall maintain a complete record
4741 of each surplus lines contract obtained by the agent, including any
4842 of the following, if applicable:
4943 (1) a copy of the daily report;
5044 (2) the amount of the insurance and risks insured
5145 against;
5246 (3) a brief general description of the property
5347 insured and the location of that property;
5448 (4) the gross premium charged;
5549 (5) the return premium paid;
5650 (6) the rate of premium charged on the different items
5751 of property;
5852 (7) the contract terms, including the effective date;
5953 (8) the insured's name and post office address;
6054 (9) the insurer's name and home office address;
6155 (10) the amount collected from the insured;
6256 (11) an agreement under Section 225.006(c);
6357 (12) evidence establishing that:
6458 (A) the insured qualified as an exempt commercial
6559 purchaser and that the surplus lines agent complied with the
6660 requirements of Section 981.004(c) if a diligent effort to obtain
6761 insurance in the admitted market was not made pursuant to Section
6862 981.004(a)(1); or
6963 (B) the insured qualified as an industrial
7064 insured and that the surplus lines agent complied with the
7165 requirements of Section 981.004(d) if a diligent effort to obtain
7266 insurance in the admitted market was not made pursuant to Section
7367 981.004(a)(1); and
7468 (13) any other information required by the department.
7569 SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
7670 an insurance policy delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on
7771 or after January 1, 2018. A policy delivered, issued for delivery,
7872 or renewed before January 1, 2018, is governed by the law as it
7973 existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that
8074 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
8175 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
82- * * * * *
76+ ______________________________ ______________________________
77+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
78+ I certify that H.B. No. 1559 was passed by the House on April
79+ 13, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 0, 2 present, not
80+ voting.
81+ ______________________________
82+ Chief Clerk of the House
83+ I certify that H.B. No. 1559 was passed by the Senate on May
84+ 11, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
85+ ______________________________
86+ Secretary of the Senate
87+ APPROVED: _____________________
88+ Date
89+ _____________________
90+ Governor