Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1559 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Frullo (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 1559
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
 April 19, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 9, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 9, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of surplus lines insurance to certain
 commercial insureds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 981, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 981.0033 to read as follows:
 Sec. 981.0033.  INDUSTRIAL INSURED DEFINED. For purposes of
 this chapter, "industrial insured" means a person who purchases
 commercial insurance and, at the time of placement:
 (1)  employs or retains a qualified risk manager to
 negotiate insurance coverage; and
 (2)  either:
 (A)  has paid aggregate nationwide commercial
 property and casualty insurance premiums of more than $25,000 in
 the immediately preceding 12 months; or
 (B)  employs at least 25 full-time employees.
 SECTION 2.  Section 981.004, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Subsection (a)(1) does not apply to insurance procured
 for an industrial insured if:
 (1)  the agent procuring or placing the insurance
 discloses to the industrial insured that:
 (A)  comparable insurance may be available from
 the admitted market that is subject to more regulatory oversight
 than the surplus lines market; and
 (B)  a policy purchased in the admitted market may
 provide greater protection than the surplus lines insurance policy;
 (2)  the surplus lines company offering the coverage
 has a financial strength rating of A- or better from the A. M. Best
 Company; and
 (3)  after receiving the notice described by
 Subdivision (1), the industrial insured requests in writing that
 the agent procure the insurance from or place the insurance with an
 eligible surplus lines insurer.
 SECTION 3.  Section 981.215(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A surplus lines agent shall maintain a complete record
 of each surplus lines contract obtained by the agent, including any
 of the following, if applicable:
 (1)  a copy of the daily report;
 (2)  the amount of the insurance and risks insured
 against;
 (3)  a brief general description of the property
 insured and the location of that property;
 (4)  the gross premium charged;
 (5)  the return premium paid;
 (6)  the rate of premium charged on the different items
 of property;
 (7)  the contract terms, including the effective date;
 (8)  the insured's name and post office address;
 (9)  the insurer's name and home office address;
 (10)  the amount collected from the insured;
 (11)  an agreement under Section 225.006(c);
 (12)  evidence establishing that:
 (A)  the insured qualified as an exempt commercial
 purchaser and that the surplus lines agent complied with the
 requirements of Section 981.004(c) if a diligent effort to obtain
 insurance in the admitted market was not made pursuant to Section
 981.004(a)(1); or
 (B)  the insured qualified as an industrial
 insured and that the surplus lines agent complied with the
 requirements of Section 981.004(d) if a diligent effort to obtain
 insurance in the admitted market was not made pursuant to Section
 981.004(a)(1); and
 (13)  any other information required by the department.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an insurance policy delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on
 or after January 1, 2018. A policy delivered, issued for delivery,
 or renewed before January 1, 2018, is governed by the law as it
 existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *