Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2448
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1363
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2126
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2016
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#494
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1991
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1991
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 606
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 606
|
House
|
02/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|